This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 03:06:39 (UTC).

Kipp vs Kindercare Education

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Kipp filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Kindercare Education. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kipp, Kimberly

Graves, Tiyanna

Defendant

Kindercare Education LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Blumenthal, Norman B

Schmidt, Fletcher W

Defendant Attorneys

Puri, Rishi

KAUFMAN, THOMAS R.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:08 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference re Settlement heard 08/08/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Or Order filed by Kipp, Kimberly; Graves, Tiyanna on 08/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order) submitted by Kipp, Kimberly; Graves, Tiyanna rejected on 08/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Court finding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketJudgment for Graves, Tiyanna ;Kipp, Kimberly against Kindercare Education LLC in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/29/2022. See Amended Order Approving PAGA Settlement and Judgment for details

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 08/10/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDesignated as an exceptional action on 08/10/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Time: 10:08 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 08/06/2021 10:08:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 43 effective 08/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge Pursuant to 170.6 CCP filed by Kipp, Kimberly on 07/30/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 07/28/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kipp, Kimberly on 07/28/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kipp, Kimberly on 07/28/2021. Filed By: Kipp, Kimberly(Plaintiff) Refers To: Kindercare Education LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less