This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/19/2022 at 23:00:49 (UTC).

Kingsley Montclair LP vs. Rafael Bravo

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Kingsley Montclair LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rafael Bravo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kingsley Montclair LP

Defendants

Bravo, Margarita

Bravo, Rafael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hernandez, Melissa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned (Fully Satisfied) filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 08/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketWrit issued on 07/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 07/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketJudgment for Kingsley Montclair LP against Bravo, Margarita ;Bravo, Rafael in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (for Possession Only) filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 07/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Bravo, Margarita on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Bravo, Rafael on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment; and as to All Unnamed Occupants) filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 07/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketVerification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 07/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 07/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants (and Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; by Posting and Mailing) filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 07/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Sub Served Rafael Bravo Occupant) filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 07/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 27.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 06/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 06/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kingsley Montclair LP on 06/16/2021. Filed By: Kingsley Montclair LP(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bravo, Margarita(Defendant) | Bravo, Rafael(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP - MELISSA HERNANDEZ