This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 11:58:00 (UTC).

Kimberly Ann Rodriguez vs. Guilda Alicia Serrano Santillan

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Kimberly Ann Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Guilda Alicia Serrano Santillan. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Kimberly Ann

Defendant

Serrano Santillan, Guilda Alicia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ellis, Anthony

Defendant Attorney

O Connor, Edward R.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 11:23 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference - scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketBankruptcy - Notice of Filing (9:21-bk-10919-DS) filed by Serrano Santillan, Guilda Alicia on 09/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: re Minute order dated 7/16/21; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference heard 08/27/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference - scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Serrano Santillan, Guilda Alicia on 08/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Rodriguez, Kimberly Ann on 08/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Other (Request and Order for Trial Setting Conference DENIED - A Case Management Conference is scheduled for August 27, 2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 20) filed by Rodriguez, Kimberly Ann on 07/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Serrano Santillan, Guilda Alicia on 07/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketO Connor, Edward R. added as a effective 06/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (new attorney Maranga Morgenstern) filed by Serrano Santillan, Guilda Alicia on 06/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney (Bob Morgenster attorney for defendant) filed by Serrano Santillan, Guilda Alicia on 06/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Serrano Santillan, Guilda Alicia on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rodriguez, Kimberly Ann on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Kimberly Ann on 02/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rodriguez, Kimberly Ann on 02/20/2020. Filed By: Rodriguez, Kimberly Ann(Plaintiff) Refers To: Serrano Santillan, Guilda(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANTHONY