This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 19:31:13 (UTC).

Kevin Hart vs. DJ Ord Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 07/24/2012 Kevin Hart filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DJ Ord Construction Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Walsh. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Walsh

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Hart, Kevin

Hart, Peggy

SC Sheet Metal Inc

Interior Style Inc

Vintage Plastering Inc

Full Penn Welding

B & M Contractors Inc

B and M Contractors

Cast Stone and Design

Viale Interior Trim

Zoes 1 through 100

CM Concrete Inc

Tim Jenkins Construction Inc

Roes 1 through 100

Royle, Trent

Acoustical Concrete Floor Systems Inc

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ARC Design Group Inc

DJ Ord Construction Inc

SCG Inc

Wallace E Mason & Associates

B & M Contractors Inc

Royle, Trent

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Schlueter, David S

SAATJIAN, CHARLES N.

Fierman Cribbs, Stacy

CABRAL, CARLOS C

Nixon, Anthony B.

BREMER, KEITH G

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

McQueen, Michael L

Henning, Stephen J

STELLWAGEN, ROBERT H

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Fierman Cribbs, Stacy

Nixon, Anthony B.

Henning, Stephen J

STELLWAGEN, ROBERT H

Lewis, Tracy M

Other Attorneys

Martha, Richard H.

Qualls, Kenneth L

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 12:48 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 10:44 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:02 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:23 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketStatus Conference - scheduled for 06/13/2016 at 09:30:00 AM in 42 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (of Cross Complaint B&M Contractors Inc) filed by B & M Contractors Inc on 05/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 12:48 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 04/29/2016 12:48:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undeliverable (Minute Order 3/28/16 mailed to Robert Whitmore returned to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 04/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (as to Cross Complaint filed by DJ Ord Costruction Inc) filed by DJ Ord Construction Inc on 04/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Hart, Kevin; Hart, Peggy on 04/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
442 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2012
  • DocketAnswer filed by SCG Inc on 09/05/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DocketAnswer filed by ARC Design Group Inc on 08/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Wallace E Mason owner) filed by Hart, Peggy; Hart, Kevin on 08/16/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Eric Everett Hawes agent/Erica Parks person in charge) filed by Hart, Kevin; Hart, Peggy on 08/08/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (sub serve Tracey McConnell) filed by Hart, Kevin; Hart, Peggy on 08/07/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Patrick Boales Agent) filed by Hart, Kevin; Hart, Peggy on 08/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketCertificate of Merit filed by Hart, Kevin; Hart, Peggy on 07/24/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hart, Kevin; Hart, Peggy on 07/24/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hart, Kevin; Hart, Peggy on 07/24/2012. Filed By: Hart, Kevin(Plaintiff) | Hart, Peggy(Plaintiff) Refers To: DJ Ord Construction Inc(Defendant) | ARC Design Group Inc(Defendant) | SCG Inc(Defendant) | Wallace E Mason & Associates(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B&M CONTRACTORS (ROE 1)...... is a litigant

Latest cases where VINTAGE PLASTERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCG LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SC SHEET METAL INC. is a litigant