Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/10/2018 at 06:17:43 (UTC).

Kevin Green vs. Paul David Johnson

Case Summary

On 10/23/2008 Kevin Green filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Paul David Johnson. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondent / Appellees

Green, Kevin

Green, Susan

Green, Scott Thomas

Defendants and Appellants

Johnson, Paul David

Johnson, Sheila Newman

Newman, Sheila A

PDJ's Private Lenders Network

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Green, Scott Thomas

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

STEINHART, TERRAN T

Takasugi, Russell H.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Amend (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Amend (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Application for Right to Attach Order/Writ of Attachment; Event Time: 4:30 PM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Application for Right to Attach Order/Writ of Attachment; Event Time: 4:30 PM; Department: S5; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Application for Right to Attach Order/Writ of Attachment; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Application for Right to Attach Order/Writ of Attachment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 4:51 PM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 11:24 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 10:15 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
760 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2009
  • Case Management Statement filed by Johnson, Paul David on 03/05/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 04/09/2009 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • Notice - Other (of case management conference) filed by Green, Kevin; Green, Susan on 02/27/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 04/09/2009 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM at Simi Valley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Answer filed by Johnson, Paul David on 01/22/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Sheila Johnson) filed by Green, Kevin; Green, Susan on 12/31/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • Case assigned to Department S5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Green, Kevin; Green, Susan on 10/23/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Green, Kevin; Green, Susan on 10/23/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • Complaint filed by Green, Kevin; Green, Susan on 10/23/2008. Filed By: Green, Kevin(Plaintiff) | Green, Susan(Plaintiff) Refers To: Johnson, Paul(Defendant) | Johnson, Sheila(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINHART TERRAN T. ESQ.