This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/03/2018 at 03:26:46 (UTC).

KERI MOTIL VS DAVID MELKONIAN

Case Summary

On 08/10/2004 KERI MOTIL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID MELKONIAN. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0285

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOTIL, KERI

Defendant

MELKONIAN, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, RANDAL NEAL

Defendant Attorney

TADY, BRANDON K. ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2013
  • Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2012
  • Case reassigned to 44 effective 03/29/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • 07/18/2005: JURY TRIAL AFTER ARBITRATION - TIME ESTIMATE: 5 days 0:00 hours Hearing: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2005
  • 06/09/2005: Arbitration hearings set after this date require a stipulation and court order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2005
  • 05/10/2005: Arbitration hearings set after this date require a stipulation of parties and consent of the arbitrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • 03/30/2005: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2005
  • 03/11/2005: COURT'S RULING RE RESCISSION OF ARBITRATOR Hearing: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2004
  • 09/15/2004: Overage Amount (UNLIMITED) posted by DAVID MELKONIAN Receipt Number: 409150300 for $3.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • 09/15/2004: Answer (Unlimited Jurisdiction) to COMPLAINT of MOTIL filed by DAVID MELKONIAN, represented by BRANDON K. TADY ESQ Receipt Number: 409150296 for $232.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2004
  • 09/01/2004: Proof of Service (Sub-service) of Summons and COMPLAINT of MOTIL as to DAVID MELKONIAN, by sub-serving TATYANA MELKONIAN/CO OCCUPANT. Mailing date of 08/23/04.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • 08/10/2004: Vertical Case Assignment S5 - Simi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • 08/10/2004: Track assignment: Economic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • 08/10/2004: Summons Issued; 30 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • 08/10/2004: Case Information Sheet filed. Type of trial requested: JURY. Estimated time: 3 DAYS. Mediation eligible NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • 08/10/2004: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • 08/10/2004: (L) Complaint filed - prayer amount over $10,000.00. Receipt Number: 408100105 for $258.0 Filed By: MOTIL, KERI(Plaintiff) Refers To: MELKONIAN, DAVID(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • 08/10/2004: Amount prayed: COMPENSATORY DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less