This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 06:54:57 (UTC).

Kendall v. Bank of America et al.,

Case Summary

On 03/26/2012 Kendall filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bank of America . This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Fred R. Kendall Trust

Kendall, Fred R

Kendall, Jeffrey A

Defendants

Bank of America Corporation

First American Title Company

Recontrust Company N.A.

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC

Regional Trustee Services Corporation

Saxon Mortgage Services Inc

Bank of America N.A.

Odegard, Arlen P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Noah

Defendant Attorneys

Quinto, Sara J

Dicker, Kevin S.

Watts, Joshua D

Dalusio, Nicolas A.

Faigal, Dennis M

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 9:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
177 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served upon Amanda Garcia agent for CT corp) filed by Kendall, Jeffrey A on 04/20/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/03/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM) is scheduled for 04/23/2012 at 09:20 AM in Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM) - scheduled for 04/23/2012 at 09:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Ex Parte - TRO to enjoin sale of property scheduled for 04/03/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (re OSC and Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Kendall, Jeffrey A; Kendall, Fred R; The Fred R. Kendall Trust on 04/03/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kendall, Jeffrey A; Kendall, Fred R; The Fred R. Kendall Trust on 03/26/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Kendall, Jeffrey A; Kendall, Fred R; The Fred R. Kendall Trust on 03/26/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Complaint (to Enjoin Foreclosure) filed by Kendall, Jeffrey A; Kendall, Fred R; The Fred R. Kendall Trust on 03/26/2012. Filed By: Kendall, Jeffrey A(Plaintiff) | Kendall, Fred R(Plaintiff) | The Fred R. Kendall Trust(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bank of America N.A.(Defendant) | Bank of America Corporation(Defendant) | Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc(Defendant) | Recontrust Company N.A.(Defendant) | Saxon Mortgage Services Inc(Defendant) | Regional Trustee Services Corporation(Defendant) | First American Title Company(Defendant) | Odegard, Arlen(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less