This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 20:30:06 (UTC).

Kelly Welsh vs Anthem Blue Cross Life

Case Summary

On 11/14/2014 Kelly Welsh filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Anthem Blue Cross Life. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Evangelisti, Robyn

LaCroix, Cheryl A

Welsh, Kelly

Defendants

Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company

The Anthem Companies of California Inc

WellPoint Inc

The Anthem Companies Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GALICI, SAMUEL F.

Zarkowski, Constance N

Defendant Attorneys

Furuta, Reiko

Wortman, Jeffrey A

REGAN, COLLEEN M.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 8:41 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 8:41 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 10 day jury trial; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 10 day jury trial; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2015
  • Objection (in Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration) filed by Evangelisti, Robyn; LaCroix, Cheryl A; Welsh, Kelly on 01/20/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Declaration - Other (of Denise Held in support of Deft's petition for an order to compel arbitration) filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company on 12/19/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Declaration - Other (of Reiko Furata in support of petition for an order to compel arbitration) filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company on 12/19/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Motion to Compel - for an Order to compel arbitration; Memo fo p&a's in support thereof scheduled for 01/30/2015 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Petition - Other (for an Order to compel arbitration; Memo fo p&a's in support thereof) filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company on 12/19/2014. Filed By: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Kirsten Edralin of CT Corporation agent) filed by LaCroix, Cheryl A; Welsh, Kelly on 12/03/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/13/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Welsh, Kelly; LaCroix, Cheryl A; Evangelisti, Robyn on 11/14/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Complaint filed by Welsh, Kelly; LaCroix, Cheryl A; Evangelisti, Robyn on 11/14/2014. Filed By: Welsh, Kelly(Plaintiff) | LaCroix, Cheryl A(Plaintiff) | Evangelisti, Robyn(Plaintiff) Refers To: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(Defendant) | The Anthem Companies Inc(Defendant) | The Anthem Companies of California Inc(Defendant) | WellPoint Inc(Defendant) | The Anthem Companies of California Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less