This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/22/2021 at 11:40:35 (UTC).

Kelly R Barth vs. Drew Dawson

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Kelly R Barth filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Drew Dawson. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Barth, Kelly R

Respondent

Dawson, Drew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRestraining order request is withdrawn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketConsent For Court Assignment (Re: Commissioner Redmond) filed by Dawson, Drew on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (CH-100 Request for CH Restraining Order; CH-109 Notice of Court Hearing, CH-110 TRO; ETC) filed by Barth, Kelly R on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketHearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 02/17/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketHearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 01/25/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (denied) filed by Barth, Kelly R on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Denied) filed by Barth, Kelly R on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (GRANTED) filed by Barth, Kelly R on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketBarth, Kelly R Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Barth, Kelly R on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketConsent For Court Assignment filed by Barth, Kelly R on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Barth, Kelly R on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Barth, Kelly R on 11/19/2020. Filed By: Barth, Kelly R(Petitioner) Refers To: Dawson, Drew(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less