Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 23:07:28 (UTC).

Kelley Jackson vs. Jesus Trinidad Martinez

Case Summary

On 02/03/2015 Kelley Jackson filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jesus Trinidad Martinez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackson, Kelley

Defendants

JPM Trucking Inc

Martinez, Jesus Trinidad

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion To Vacate Judgment (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion To Vacate Judgment (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion To Vacate Judgment (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed by Jackson, Kelley on 04/21/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Motion To Vacate Judgment (SC) heard 04/06/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Motion to Vacate Judgment denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Motion To Vacate Judgment (SC) - scheduled for 04/06/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Amount of 20.00 received for 09 - Motion to vacate on 03/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 03/23/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Kelley Jackson and AGAINST JPM Trucking Inc, Jesus Trinidad Martinez in the amount of $2487.50 principal, $80.00 costs. Judgment Details: The Court orders that the liability is joint and several. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (Signature is illegible on 2-10-2015. Cost $15.00) filed by Jackson, Kelley on 02/17/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (signature is illegible, no date, cost of $15.00) filed by Jackson, Kelley on 02/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Certifed mailing of plaintiffs claim to both defendats mailed out on 02/03/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Certified Mail Receipt (Costs 15.00) filed by Jackson, Kelley on 02/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Certified Mail Receipt (costs 15.00) filed by Jackson, Kelley on 02/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 03/23/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Jackson, Kelley on 02/03/2015. Filed By: Jackson, Kelley(Plaintiff) Refers To: Martinez, Jesus(Defendant) | JPM Trucking Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPM Trucking Inc is a litigant