This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/16/2018 at 06:04:07 (UTC).

Kathy Lewis vs. Melissa La Vallette

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 Kathy Lewis filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Melissa La Vallette. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lewis, Kathy

Lewis, Kelsey

Defendants

La Vallette, Melissa

La Vallette, David

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 09/11/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for dismissal after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for dismissal after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal ($40.00 Cost, Served on 07/31/2017) filed by Lewis, Kathy on 08/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal ($40.00 served on 7/20/17) filed by Lewis, Kathy; Lewis, Kelsey on 07/24/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 09/11/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Lewis, Kathy; Lewis, Kelsey on 07/17/2017. Filed By: Lewis, Kelsey(Plaintiff) | Lewis, Kathy(Plaintiff) Refers To: La Vallette, Melissa(Defendant) | La Vallette, David(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less