This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/19/2022 at 13:24:35 (UTC).

Katherine Stubblefield vs. Juan Escobedo

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Katherine Stubblefield filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Juan Escobedo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stubblefield, Katherine

Defendants

JLS Concrete Pumping Inc

Brundage Bone Concrete Pumping Inc

Escobedo, Juan

Brundagebone Concrete LSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcus, Gerald L.

Defendant Attorney

Gates, James W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name filed by Brundage Bone Concrete Pumping Inc; Brundagebone Concrete LSE on 02/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Brundage Bone Concrete Pumping Inc; Brundagebone Concrete LSE; Escobedo, Juan on 07/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Brundage Bone Concrete Pumping Inc; Brundagebone Concrete LSE; Escobedo, Juan on 07/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Julie Payne, Office manger & person in charge) filed by Stubblefield, Katherine on 06/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Julie Payne, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process) filed by Stubblefield, Katherine on 06/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Stubblefield, Katherine on 06/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served to CSC- Nicole Stauss- Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process) filed by Stubblefield, Katherine on 06/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stubblefield, Katherine on 02/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Stubblefield, Katherine on 02/24/2021. Filed By: Stubblefield, Katherine(Plaintiff) Refers To: Brundage Bone Concrete Pumping Inc(Defendant) | JLS Concrete Pumping Inc(Defendant) | Escobedo, Juan(Defendant) | Brundagebone Concrete LSE(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JLS Concrete Pumping Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Brundage Bone Concrete Pumping Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE