This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 00:31:29 (UTC).

Karl McClain vs. Pacific Maritime Association

Case Summary

On 06/11/2013 Karl McClain filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Pacific Maritime Association. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

McClain, Karl

Defendants and Respondent / Appellees

International Longshore and Warehouse Union

Los Angeles and Long Beach Harbors

Pacific Maritime Association

Port Hueneme Joint Port Labor Relations Committee

International Longshore & Warehouse Union Local 46

Interested Party

The International Longshore & Warehouse Union Local 46

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

APPLETON, HEATHER

GAMBOA, SANDRA J.

Defendant and Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Lawrence, Larry M

Goldberg, Gillian B

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:44 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:34 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:52 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:44 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:34 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
364 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2013
  • Minutes finalized for heard 06/24/2013 01:52:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • The case is reassigned to Department 40 for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Declaration of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed by McClain, Karl on 06/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted) filed by McClain, Karl on 06/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • McClain, Karl Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/13/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by McClain, Karl on 06/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by McClain, Karl on 06/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Complaint filed by McClain, Karl on 06/11/2013. Filed By: McClain, Karl(Plaintiff) Refers To: Pacific Maritime Association(Defendant) | Port Hueneme Joint Port Labor Relations Committee(Defendant) | International Longshore and Warehouse Union(Defendant) | Los Angeles and Long Beach Harbors(Defendant) | The International Longshore & Warehouse Union Local 46(Interested Party) | International Longshore & Warehouse Union Local 46(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less