This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 07:04:05 (UTC).

Kalid Loul vs. Jacqueline Loul

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Kalid Loul filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Jacqueline Loul. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loul, Kalid

Defendants

Loul, Jacqueline

Hover, Mark Andrew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michie, Douglas C.

Defendant Attorney

HOVER, MARK A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:57 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Loul, Kalid on 03/13/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice - Other (Re Non-Appearance of Doug Michie at 3/24/2023 Case Management Conference) filed by Loul, Kalid on 03/13/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketSummons issued on 02/27/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint - Amended filed by Loul, Kalid on 02/27/2023. Filed By: Loul, Kalid(Plaintiff) Refers To: Loul, Jacqueline(Defendant) | Hover, Mark(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketHover, Mark Andrew added as a Defendant effective 02/27/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (GRANTED) filed by Loul, Jacqueline on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketLoul, Jacqueline Application for Waiver granted in full.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Loul, Jacqueline on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM) heard 02/10/2023 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,021 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less