Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 18:59:10 (UTC).

J.W. Bruce & Company, LLC. vs. J&H Engineering General Contractors, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2013 J W Bruce Company, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J H Engineering General Contractors, Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.W. Bruce & Company, LLC.

Defendants

J&H Engineering General Contractors, Inc

J&H Engineering General Contractors, Inc.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2016
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2014
  • Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 03/01/2013 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (Signed By: Sandra Tauotta On: 01/22/13 Costs: 10.00) filed by J.W. Bruce & Company, LLC. on 01/23/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Certified Mail sent to: J&H Engineering General Contractors, Inc. Agent: Howard C. Janotta On: 01/18/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by J.W. Bruce & Company, LLC. on 01/18/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Fictitious Business Name Declaration filed by J.W. Bruce & Company, LLC. on 01/18/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 03/01/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 44 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by J.W. Bruce & Company, LLC. on 01/18/2013. Filed By: J.W. Bruce & Company, LLC.(Plaintiff) Refers To: J&H Engineering General Contractors, Inc.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J & H Engineering General Contractors Inc is a litigant