This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 20:06:13 (UTC).

Julie Latimer vs. Cal American Water

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Julie Latimer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cal American Water. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latimer, Julie

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Best Western Plus Inc

Cal American Water

California American Water Company

Innocenti Construction Inc

Westchase Mini Suites LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HART, DAVID L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Jenkins, Michael E

Murphy, Michael C Jr

Cross Defendant Attorney

Lawson, Carolyn M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Westchase Mini Suites LLC on 04/29/2022. Filed By: Westchase Mini Suites LLC(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Innocenti Construction Inc(Cross - Defendant) | California American Water Company(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Westchase Mini Suites LLC on 04/29/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketWestchase Mini Suites LLC added as a Defendant effective 04/29/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Doe amendment. Signed by Michael Murphy, counsel of Westchase Mini suites LLC) filed by Latimer, Julie on 03/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Old Michael E. Jenkins New Carolyn Lawson) filed by California American Water Company on 03/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Naming Doe 2 as Westchase Mini Suites LLC) filed by Latimer, Julie on 03/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketWestchase Mini Suites LLC added as a Defendant effective 03/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by California American Water Company on 03/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Naming Doe 1 as Innocenti Construction Inc) filed by Latimer, Julie on 02/25/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (First) submitted by Latimer, Julie rejected on 02/08/2022. Filed By: Latimer, Julie(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by California American Water Company on 12/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by California American Water Company on 12/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketJenkins, Michael E added as a effective 12/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCalifornia American Water Company added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute submitted by Latimer, Julie rejected on 11/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Daniel Adam Assistant General Manager Person Authorized to Accept) filed by Latimer, Julie on 11/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 10/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Latimer, Julie on 10/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Latimer, Julie on 10/21/2021. Filed By: Latimer, Julie(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cal American Water(Defendant) | Best Western Plus Inc(Defendant) | California American Water Company(Defendant) | Innocenti Construction Inc(Defendant) | Westchase Mini Suites LLC(Defendant) | Westchase Mini Suites LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Best Western Plus Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Westchase Mini Suites LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where California-American Water Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL-AMERICAN CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant