This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 10:51:23 (UTC).

Juan Ruiz vs. Fidencio Silva Flores

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Juan Ruiz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fidencio Silva Flores. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruiz, Juan Jr

Defendants

Silva Flores, Fidencio

Missionaries of the Holy Spirit

The Archdiocese of Los Angeles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramirez, Gregory J.

Defendant Attorneys

Waxler, Andrew J.

HENNIGAN, J. MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Missionaries of the Holy Spirit on 08/19/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Or Order filed by Missionaries of the Holy Spirit on 08/19/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDefault vacated as to Missionaries of the Holy Spirit on Complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint; to Set Aside Default Entered Against Defendant Missionaries of the Holy Spirit) filed by Missionaries of the Holy Spirit on 08/12/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Set Aside Default Entered Against Defendant Missionaries of the Holy Spirit) submitted by Missionaries of the Holy Spirit rejected on 08/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer submitted by Missionaries of the Holy Spirit rejected on 07/28/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Ruiz, Juan Jr on 07/15/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by The Archdiocese of Los Angeles on 06/25/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Miguel Marquez, Agent of Process for Service; Statement of Damages) filed by Ruiz, Juan Jr on 05/19/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Statement of Damages; served upon Amanda Ardilla, Agent of Process for Service) filed by Ruiz, Juan Jr on 05/11/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Full) filed by Ruiz, Juan Jr on 02/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRuiz, Juan Jr Application for Waiver granted in full.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Ruiz, Juan Jr on 02/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ruiz, Juan Jr on 02/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ruiz, Juan Jr on 02/09/2021. Filed By: Ruiz, Juan Jr(Plaintiff) Refers To: Silva Flores, Fidencio(Defendant) | Missionaries of the Holy Spirit(Defendant) | The Archdiocese of Los Angeles(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less