This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 12:24:57 (UTC).

Jose Vazquez vs. ETS Express Inc

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Jose Vazquez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ETS Express Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vazquez, Jose

Defendants

ETS Express Inc

ETS Express LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aiwazian, Edwin

Defendant Attorney

DE CASTRO, DAVID M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint by Defendants ETS Express, Inc. and ETS Express, LLC [PAGA Action]) filed by ETS Express Inc; ETS Express LLC on 02/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Served David De Castro, Atty for ETS Express LLC, per CCP 415.30) filed by Vazquez, Jose on 01/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Served David De Castro, Atty for ETS Express LLC) filed by Vazquez, Jose on 01/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 41 effective 12/18/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (56-2020-00545435-CU-OE-VTA Vazquez vs ETS Express Inc et al, 56-2020-00546267-CU-OE-VTA Santana et al vs ETS Express LLC) filed by ETS Express Inc; ETS Express LLC on 12/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketSummons issued on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vazquez, Jose on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Vazquez, Jose on 11/19/2020. Filed By: Vazquez, Jose(Plaintiff) Refers To: ETS Express Inc(Defendant) | ETS Express LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ETS Express LLC is a litigant