This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 07:10:47 (UTC).

Jose Manuel Garcia vs. Mikeq Murillo

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Jose Manuel Garcia filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mikeq Murillo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Jose Manuel

Defendant

Murillo, Mike

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned (Satisfied) filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 06/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketWrit issued on 05/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketJudgment for Garcia, Jose Manuel against Murillo, Mike in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 05/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted) filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketGarcia, Jose Manuel Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 27.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Garcia, Jose Manuel on 05/12/2021. Filed By: Garcia, Jose Manuel(Plaintiff) Refers To: Murillo, Mike(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD