This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 00:02:37 (UTC).

Jose Machado vs. Ismael Lopez

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Jose Machado filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ismael Lopez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Machado, Jose

Defendants

Lopez and Sons

Lopez, Ismael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dolan, Christopher B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM) - scheduled for 11/24/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM) - scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 10/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) filed by Dolan, Christopher B. on 10/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Dolan, Christopher B. on 10/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Dolan, Christopher B. on 10/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Machado, Jose on 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Machado, Jose on 07/19/2021. Filed By: Machado, Jose(Plaintiff) Refers To: Lopez, Ismael(Defendant) | Lopez and Sons(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lopez and Sons is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLAN CHRISTOPHER B