This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 05:04:16 (UTC).

Jose Julio Herta Guerrero vs. BZB Towing

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Jose Julio Herta Guerrero filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BZB Towing. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guerrero, Jose Julio Herta

Defendants

Automotive Consulting Team

BZB Towing

Joel Zaragoza as Successor in interest to the Estate of Jose Zaragoza Tinoco

Zaragoza, Bricio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Myers, David A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Guerrero, Jose Julio Herta on 11/01/2021. Filed By: Guerrero, Jose Julio Herta(Plaintiff) Refers To: Zaragoza, Bricio(Defendant) | Joel Zaragoza as Successor in interest to the Estate of Jose Zaragoza Tinoco(Defendant) | BZB Towing(Defendant) | Automotive Consulting Team(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Case No 56.19.00529595 & Case No 56.14.457018) filed by Guerrero, Jose Julio Herta on 09/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case submitted by Guerrero, Jose Julio Herta rejected on 09/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 09/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Guerrero, Jose Julio Herta on 09/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Guerrero, Jose Julio Herta on 09/01/2021. Filed By: Guerrero, Jose Julio Herta(Plaintiff) Refers To: BZB Towing(Defendant) | Joel Zaragoza as Successor in interest to the Estate of Jose Zaragoza Tinoco(Defendant) | Zaragoza, Bricio(Defendant) | Automotive Consulting Team(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYERS DAVID A. ESQ.