This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 22:04:08 (UTC).

Jordan vs The Yoho Group

Case Summary

On 11/22/2016 Jordan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Yoho Group. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jordan, Inge

Defendants

Yordy, Jeffrey

The Yoho Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baskin, Robert M

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: /OSC Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default/Default Judgment; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • Case Management Statement filed by Jordan, Inge on 04/04/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Out of State (Service on the Arizona Corporation Commission by mail on Dec. 21, 2016 from Ventura, California due to failure of corporation to maintain an authorized agent of service of process per Arizona Revised Statutes section 10-504(b)) filed by Jordan, Inge on 01/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Out of State submitted by Jordan, Inge rejected on 12/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Summons issued on 12/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Complaint - Amended (First) filed by Jordan, Inge on 12/20/2016. Filed By: Jordan, Inge(Plaintiff) Refers To: The Yoho Group Inc(Defendant) | Yordy, Jeffrey(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Summons issued on 11/29/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/19/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jordan, Inge on 11/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Complaint filed by Jordan, Inge on 11/22/2016. Filed By: Jordan, Inge(Plaintiff) Refers To: The Yoho Group Inc(Defendant) | Yordy, Jeffrey(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less