This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 08/12/2023 at 13:14:21 (UTC).

Jonathan Javier Martinez vs. Mauricio Ledesma

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 Jonathan Javier Martinez filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Mauricio Ledesma. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CUBC

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martinez, Jonathan Javier

Defendants

Diaz, Gerardo

Ledesma, Mauricio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramirez, Gregory J.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 3:03 PM; Document: Minutes

Request for Entry of Default; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant); Requested Judgment Type: __

03/21/2023: Request for Entry of Default; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant); Requested Judgment Type: __

Request for Entry of Default; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Requested Judgment Type: __

03/21/2023: Request for Entry of Default; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Requested Judgment Type: __

Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

04/07/2023: Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

04/07/2023: Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

04/27/2023: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

05/02/2023: Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant)

05/15/2023: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant)

Declaration of Jonathan M Martinez in Support Request for Entry of Default Judgment; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant)

05/15/2023: Declaration of Jonathan M Martinez in Support Request for Entry of Default Judgment; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant)

Minute Order (Default Prove Up Hearing)

05/22/2023: Minute Order (Default Prove Up Hearing)

Exhibit List; Generated by: Court

05/22/2023: Exhibit List; Generated by: Court

Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

05/30/2023: Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

06/01/2023: Notice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

Updated -- Judgment:; Status Date changed from 06/02/2023 to 06/07/2023; Status changed from Received to Filed

06/07/2023: Updated -- Judgment:; Status Date changed from 06/02/2023 to 06/07/2023; Status changed from Received to Filed

Abstract of Judgment; Issued by: Court; As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant)

08/03/2023: Abstract of Judgment; Issued by: Court; As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Status: Vacated; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice; Result: Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment; Issued by: Court; As to: Diaz, Gerardo (Defendant); Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • HearingName: Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default Judgment; Status: Vacated; Department: Dept 20 / Hall of Justice; Result: Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Jonathan Javier Martinez against Defendant Mauricio Ledesma and Defendant Gerardo Diaz on the Complaint filed by JONATHAN JAVIER MARTINEZ on 01/20/2023 for damages of $137,000.00, interest of $20,116.08, and costs of $835.00 for a total of $157,951.08.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment:; Status Date changed from 06/02/2023 to 06/07/2023; Status changed from Received to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketCourt Order scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:15 AM in at Department 22B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Generated by: Court; As to: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Prejudgment Interest Calculation; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Ledesma, Mauricio; On the Complaint filed by JONATHAN JAVIER MARTINEZ on 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default; Filed by: Martinez, Jonathan Javier (Plaintiff); As to: Ledesma, Mauricio (Defendant); Requested Judgment Type: __

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Martinez, Jonathan Javier on 03/14/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Martinez, Jonathan Javier on 03/14/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingName: Case Management Conference; Status: Scheduled; Department: /; Result: On 01/31/2023, Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference heard 01/31/2023 03:03:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martinez, Jonathan Javier on 01/20/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint filed by Martinez, Jonathan Javier on 01/20/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less