This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 18:34:56 (UTC).

John Sheffield vs. Elisabeth Metzidis

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 John Sheffield filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Elisabeth Metzidis. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheffield, John

Defendant

Metzidis, Elisabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Delaplane, Christopher E

Defendant Attorney

PIERCE, DAVID H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Sheffield, John on 11/28/2022. Filed By: Sheffield, John(Plaintiff) Refers To: Metzidis, Elisabeth(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Electronic Transfer) filed by Metzidis, Elisabeth on 11/16/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension filed by Metzidis, Elisabeth on 11/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Jane Doe, Co-Occupant) filed by Sheffield, John on 10/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sheffield, John on 10/06/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sheffield, John on 10/06/2022. Filed By: Sheffield, John(Plaintiff) Refers To: Metzidis, Elisabeth(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELAPLANE, CHRISTOPHER E.