This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 13:24:38 (UTC).

John Rice vs. Robert Rice

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 John Rice filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Robert Rice. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Rice, John

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Rice, Robert

Robert Rice and Palma Rice Trustees of the Rice Family Revocable Trust

Rice, Palma

Robert Rice individually and as trustee of Rice Family Revocable Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Shapiro, Seth P.

Wheeler, David C

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Regnier, Georgianna

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (5 day); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 11/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Complaint - Amended (SECOND) filed by Rice, John on 10/25/2017. Filed By: Rice, John(Plaintiff) Refers To: Robert Rice and Palma Rice Trustees of the Rice Family Revocable Trust dated May 15 2008(Defendant) | Rice, Robert(Defendant) | Robert Rice individually and as trustee of Rice Family Revocable Trust(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (for leave to file second amended complaint) filed by Rice, John on 10/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney (OLD: Seth Shapiro NEW: David C Wheeler) filed by Rice, John on 09/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Summons issued on 07/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint - Amended (First) filed by Rice, John on 07/18/2017. Filed By: Rice, John(Plaintiff) Refers To: Robert Rice and Palma Rice Trustees of the Rice Family Revocable Trust dated May 15 2008(Defendant) | Rice, Robert(Defendant) | Rice, Palma(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rice, John on 07/14/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Complaint filed by Rice, John on 07/14/2017. Filed By: Rice, John(Plaintiff) Refers To: Rice, Robert(Defendant) | Rice, Palma(Defendant) | Robert Rice and Palma Rice Trustees of the Rice Family Revocable Trust dated May 15 2008(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less