This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 05:01:06 (UTC).

Jenny Roe vs. Phyllis Perce

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 Jenny Roe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Phyllis Perce. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roe, Jenny

Defendants

Perce, Alfred

Perce, Phyllis

Perce, Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shegerian, Carney R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2024
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (General Denial) filed by Perce, Alfred; Perce, Phyllis; Perce, Robert on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by Perce, Alfred; Perce, Phyllis; Perce, Robert on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (GRANTED) filed by Perce, Robert on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketPerce, Robert Application for Waiver granted in full.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Perce, Robert on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (GRANTED) filed by Perce, Phyllis on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketPerce, Phyllis Application for Waiver granted in full.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Perce, Phyllis on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (GRANTED) filed by Perce, Alfred on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketPerce, Alfred Application for Waiver granted in full.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Perce, Alfred on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Phyllis Perce, Co-Occupant) filed by Roe, Jenny on 12/08/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Roe, Jenny on 12/08/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Phyllis Perce, Co-Occupant) filed by Roe, Jenny on 12/08/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Roe, Jenny on 11/15/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Roe, Jenny on 11/15/2022. Filed By: Roe, Jenny(Plaintiff) Refers To: Perce, Phyllis(Defendant) | Perce, Alfred(Defendant) | Perce, Robert(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R