This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 05:01:31 (UTC).

Jennifer Quinonez vs. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 Jennifer Quinonez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Quinonez, Jennifer

Villalpando, Claudia

Defendants

BMB Automotive Inc

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lovasz, Christopher M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Raul Monzon Legal Assistant Person in Charge of Office) filed by Villalpando, Claudia; Quinonez, Jennifer on 07/18/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt submitted by Quinonez, Jennifer; Quinonez, Jennifer rejected on 07/07/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (to Jenn Bautista, Person Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Quinonez, Jennifer on 06/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quinonez, Jennifer; Villalpando, Claudia on 06/07/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Quinonez, Jennifer; Villalpando, Claudia on 06/07/2022. Filed By: Villalpando, Claudia(Plaintiff) | Quinonez, Jennifer(Plaintiff) Refers To: General Motors LLC(Defendant) | BMB Automotive Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER