This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 05:19:37 (UTC).

Jennifer Lubin vs. Omar Angel Perez

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Jennifer Lubin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Omar Angel Perez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lubin, Jennifer

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Korkunis, Jordyn Clarice

Acme Valley Security SVCS

Perez, Omar Angel

Acme Valley Security Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcus, Gerald L.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Scofield, Elyse K.

Flores, Zojeila

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel (Counsel Unavailable From October 29, 2021 to November 15, 2021) filed by Acme Valley Security Services Inc; Perez, Omar Angel on 10/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Acme Valley Security Services Inc; Perez, Omar Angel on 10/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Korkunis, Jordyn Clarice on 07/19/2021. Filed By: Korkunis, Jordyn Clarice(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Perez, Omar(Cross - Defendant) | Acme Valley Security SVCS(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPerez, Omar Angel added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Demand for Trial by Jury) filed by Korkunis, Jordyn Clarice on 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 07/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Acme Valley Security Services Inc; Perez, Omar Angel on 07/02/2021. Filed By: Perez, Omar Angel(Cross - Complainant) | Acme Valley Security Services Inc(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Korkunis, Jordyn(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Acme Valley Security Services Inc; Perez, Omar Angel on 07/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAcme Valley Security Services Inc added as a Defendant effective 07/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (subserved to Jim Korkunis- Father- Co-Occupant) filed by Lubin, Jennifer on 06/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (subserved to Leah Perez- Co-Occupant) filed by Lubin, Jennifer on 06/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served upon Tina H, Person Authorized to Accept Service on 5/25/2021) filed by Lubin, Jennifer on 06/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lubin, Jennifer on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lubin, Jennifer on 02/01/2021. Filed By: Lubin, Jennifer(Plaintiff) Refers To: Perez, Omar(Defendant) | Korkunis, Jordyn(Defendant) | Acme Valley Security SVCS(Defendant) | Acme Valley Security Services Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE