This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 14:32:34 (UTC).

Jeffrey Vallens vs. Toi Cook

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Jeffrey Vallens filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Toi Cook. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vallens, Jeffrey

Defendant

Cook, Toi

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Writ has been updated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Vallens, Jeffrey on 09/26/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Writ issued on 01/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (0.00 Costs, 0.00 Credit, 222.36 Interest) filed by Vallens, Jeffrey on 01/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Vallens, Jeffrey on 01/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney (OLD self represented, NEW John T Medlen) filed by Vallens, Jeffrey on 01/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Judgment for Vallens, Jeffrey against Cook, Toi in the amount of: 3650.00 principal, punitive damages, 100.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 06/06/2016. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 06/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Jeffrey Vallens and AGAINST Toi Cook in the amount of $3650.00 principal, $100.00 costs. Judgment Details: None. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (Served on James Townsend, business partner on 5-3-16 cost 50.00) filed by Vallens, Jeffrey on 06/06/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 06/06/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 06/06/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Vallens, Jeffrey on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Vallens, Jeffrey(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cook, Toi(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less