This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/09/2018 at 22:11:39 (UTC).

Jean Littleton vs. Celia Gallardo

Case Summary

On 07/30/2008 Jean Littleton filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Celia Gallardo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Lincors, David

Littleton, Jean

Defendants, Respondent / Appellees and Cross Plaintiffs

EXECUTIVE ESCROW COMPANY INC

Peppertree Financial

El Camino Partners LLC

Gallardo, Celia

Mahn, Rick

Executive 1031 Exchange Services Inc

Kirkham, Alana

Kirkham, Daniel

Kuntz, Miki

Richards, Loyann

Executive Escrow Company

Gold Credit Investments

Gold Feather Realty, Inc.

Kuntz, Damon

Peppertree Financial Inc

Polk, Marcus

Cross Defendant

Fidelity National Title Insurance Company

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Perrin, Steven K

Defendant, Respondent / Appellee and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Shields, Jeffrey W

HALLE, WILLIAM E.

Jones, David Dunlap

Tate, M Adam

Varner, Rick A

Cross Defendant Attorney

Granet, Craig S

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Vacate; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Vacate; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:37 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Vacate; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Vacate; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 10:37 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
744 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2008
  • DocketEx Parte - Ex Application for Issuance of a TRO scheduled for 10/29/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in S5 at Simi Valley.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (for Issuance of a TRO) filed by Littleton, Jean; Lincors, David on 10/27/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • DocketOSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - File Proof of Service on Complaint of Littleton as to Defendants Executive Escrow Company. Gold Feather Realty Inc. Gold Credit Investments. Peppertree Financial. Celia Gallardo. Marcus J Polk scheduled for 11/06/2008 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM at Simi Valley.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • DocketAnswer (of Damon Kuntz Executive Escrow Company Inc and Peppertree Financial Inc to Plaintiffs Complaint for Promissory Fraud Cancellation of of Written Instruments Declaratory Relief Preliminary and Permanent Injunctions Promissory Fraud Breach of etc) filed by EXECUTIVE ESCROW COMPANY INC; PEPPERTREE FINANCIAL INC; Kuntz, Damon on 09/16/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • DocketPEPPERTREE FINANCIAL INC added as a Defendant effective 09/16/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • DocketEXECUTIVE ESCROW COMPANY INC added as a Defendant effective 09/16/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • DocketCase assigned to Department S5.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • DocketDeclaration for Court Assignment filed by Littleton, Jean; Lincors, David on 07/30/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Littleton, Jean; Lincors, David on 07/30/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • DocketComplaint filed by Littleton, Jean; Lincors, David on 07/30/2008. Filed By: Littleton, Jean(Plaintiff) | Lincors, David(Plaintiff) Refers To: EXECUTIVE ESCROW COMPANY INC(Defendant) | Peppertree Financial Inc(Defendant) | Gallardo, Celia(Defendant) | Polk, Marcus(Defendant) | Kuntz, Damon(Defendant) | Executive Escrow Company(Defendant) | Gold Feather Realty, Inc.(Defendant) | Gold Credit Investments(Defendant) | Peppertree Financial(Defendant) | Kuntz, Miki(Defendant) | Kirkham, Alana(Defendant) | Kirkham, Daniel(Defendant) | Richards, Loyann(Defendant) | Executive Escrow Company(Defendant) | El Camino Partners LLC(Defendant) | Executive 1031 Exchange Services Inc(Defendant) | Mahn, Rick(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig S. Granet