This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 23:25:30 (UTC).

Jason Wayne Singer vs. Colt Sport Motors, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2013 Jason Wayne Singer filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Colt Sport Motors, Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singer, Jason Wayne

Defendants

Colt Sport Motors, Inc

Colt Sport Motors, Inc.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed by Singer, Jason Wayne on 11/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment contested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Judgment for Singer, Jason Wayne against Colt Sport Motors, Inc. in the amount of: 800.00 principal, punitive damages, 85.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 06/24/2013. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 06/24/2013 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Jason Wayne Singer and AGAINST Colt Sport Motors, Inc. in the amount of $800.00 principal, $85.00 costs. Judgment Details: None. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment contested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Singer, Jason Wayne on 05/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 06/24/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Singer, Jason Wayne on 05/14/2013. Filed By: Singer, Jason Wayne(Plaintiff) Refers To: Colt Sport Motors, Inc.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLT SPORT MOTORS INC. is a litigant