This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 00:05:21 (UTC).

Janette Mendoza vs. Robert Jeffery Geiger

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Janette Mendoza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Robert Jeffery Geiger. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mendoza, Janette

Defendant

Geiger, Robert Jeffery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beloryan, Haik

Defendant Attorney

Brockenbrow, Karen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mendoza, Janette on 07/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Geiger, Robert Jeffery on 12/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Geiger, Robert Jeffery on 12/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Geiger, Robert Jeffery on 12/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketBrockenbrow, Karen added as a effective 12/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Date of service: 11/20/2020. cost 69.50) filed by Mendoza, Janette on 11/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mendoza, Janette on 10/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mendoza, Janette on 10/23/2020. Filed By: Mendoza, Janette(Plaintiff) Refers To: Geiger, Robert(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN