Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/09/2018 at 06:52:17 (UTC).

James S Brown vs. Gonsalo Delatoba

Case Summary

On 03/28/2008 James S Brown filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Gonsalo Delatoba. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2008

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Brown, James S

Defendants and Respondents

Aura Development Company

Delatoba, Gonzalo

Delatoba, Mark

Deutsche Bank National Trust, as trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I

Dorsch, Dax

Emerald Escrow Company

Lawyer's Title Insurance Company

Menchaca, Laura

NDEx West

Reed, Forrest

Surety Bonding Company of America

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Wells Fargo Home Mortgage

Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Company

CMG Escrow Company

Fernandez, Mercedes

Gutierrez, Claudia

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HILL, GREGORY

Simons, Steven A

ARONSON, MARK E

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer/ Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CCM); Event Time: 10:47 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
363 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2008
  • Motion to Strike (portions of complaint) filed by Lawyer's Title Insurance Company on 05/16/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2008
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Becky DeGeorge, authorized agent, Cau, F. 47yrs, bln hair,) filed by Brown, James S on 05/01/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Norma Jean Clark, person authorized) filed by Brown, James S on 04/30/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Jim Ellis/Vice President authorized to accept) filed by Brown, James S on 04/24/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • Proof of Service - MAILING (of notice of pendency) filed by Brown, James S on 04/23/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Margaret Wilson) filed by Brown, James S on 04/22/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2008
  • Case assigned to Department S5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2008
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Brown, James S on 03/28/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2008
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brown, James S on 03/28/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2008
  • Complaint filed by Brown, James S on 03/28/2008. Filed By: Brown, James S(Plaintiff) Refers To: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage(Defendant) | Delatoba, Gonzalo(Defendant) | Delatoba, Mark(Defendant) | Dorsch, Dax(Defendant) | Gutierrez, Claudia(Defendant) | Reed, Forrest(Defendant) | Aura Development Company(Defendant) | Lawyer's Title Insurance Company(Defendant) | NDEx West(Defendant) | Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Company(Defendant) | Deutsche Bank National Trust, as trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I(Defendant) | Emerald Escrow Company(Defendant) | CMG Escrow Company(Defendant) | Wells Fargo Bank N.A.(Defendant) | Surety Bonding Company of America(Defendant) | Fernandez, Mercedes(Defendant) | Menchaca, Laura(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERALD ESCROW INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETY BONDING COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where LAWYERS TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE is a litigant