This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:22:45 (UTC).

Jackson vs. National Express

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Jackson filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against National Express. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackson, Denis

Defendants

Durham School Services

Durham School Services LP

NE Durham Hold Corp

National Express LLC

National Express Transit Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sampson, Benjamin A

Defendant Attorney

Davis, Katessa C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (Case #2:21-cv-09231 Filed 11/24/21) filed by National Express Transit Corporation on 11/30/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by National Express Transit Corporation on 11/23/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDavis, Katessa C. added as a effective 11/23/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served to Diana Ruiz/ Agent for Service of Process) filed by Jackson, Denis on 10/27/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jackson, Denis on 10/07/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Jackson, Denis on 10/07/2021. Filed By: Jackson, Denis(Plaintiff) Refers To: National Express Transit Corporation(Defendant) | National Express LLC(Defendant) | Durham School Services(Defendant) | Durham School Services LP(Defendant) | NE Durham Hold Corp(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL EXPRESS TRANSIT CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where DURHAM SCHOOL SERVICE L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where National Express Group, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES KATESSA M