This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 16:19:38 (UTC).

In the Matter of Wilmer Estuardo Tut Maquin

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 In the Matter of Wilmer Estuardo Tut Maquin was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Minor

Tut Maquin, Wilmer Estuardo

Guardian Ad Litem

San Jose, Mario Renee Cal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor Attorney

Meinecke, Peter M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketRequest - Other (for dismissal) filed by Tut Maquin, Wilmer Estuardo on 12/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition Other (PRG); Description: for Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in whole, including court investigating fees) filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSan Jose, Mario Renee Cal Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketConsent of Proposed Guardian (and consent to appointment of guardian and waiver of notice) filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketConsent (to appointment of guardian and waiver of notice) filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPetition Other (PRG) - for Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings scheduled for 12/02/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - scheduled for 12/02/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Other (for Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings) filed by Tut Maquin, Wilmer Estuardo on 10/06/2020. Filed By: Tut Maquin, Wilmer Estuardo(Minor) Refers To: San Jose, Mario(Proposed Guardian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketInformation Release Authorization filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketGuardianship Questionnaire filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketConfidential Guardian Screening Form filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDuties of Guardian filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor(s) filed by San Jose, Mario Renee Cal on 10/06/2020. Filed By: San Jose, Mario Renee Cal(Proposed Guardian) Refers To: Tut Maquin, Wilmer(Minor)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEINECKE PETER M.