This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 18:14:00 (UTC).

In the Matter of Wendy B. Oseas

Case Summary

On 12/01/2017 In the Matter of Wendy B Oseas was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Esquibias, David A.

Claimant

AscensionPoint Recovery Services LLC on behalf of Synchrony Bank

Executor

Oseas, Mark E

Decedent

Oseas, Wendy B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

LASHLEY, KELLEY BANNON

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: For Approval and Allowance of Compensation to Guardian; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • Will admitted to probate on 01/10/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Declaration - Other (Of Melissa Sugar-Johnson RE: Petition for Probate of Will and Letters of Testamentary with ATA) filed by Johnson, Melissa Sugar on 01/10/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Johnson, Melissa Sugar added as a Interested Party effective 01/10/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Affidavit of Publication filed by Oseas, Mark E on 01/02/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Oseas, Mark E on 12/28/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 01/10/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Will Deposit filed by Oseas, Mark E on 12/01/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Oseas, Mark E on 12/01/2017. Filed By: Oseas, Mark E(Executor) Refers To: Oseas, Wendy(Decedent) | AscensionPoint Recovery Services LLC on behalf of Synchrony Bank(Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LASHLEY KELLEY BANNON