This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/10/2020 at 07:53:15 (UTC).

In The Matter of Wallace Marine

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 In The Matter of Wallace Marine was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura County Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Executors

White, Constance M

Marine, Michelle A

Decedent

Marine, Wallace

Not Classified By Court

Marine, Rebecca

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

Reinhardt, Nancy

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Application (EXP); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNIELSON, LINDSAY F. added as a Interested Party effective 06/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order (Appointing Receiver) filed by White, Constance M; Marine, Michelle A on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Oath of Receiver) filed by NIELSON, LINDSAY F. on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: Petitioner's Application For An Order Appointing Receiver; Declaration of Nancy Reinardt; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition Other (PR) heard 03/11/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketThe Court appoints Lindsay Nielson as Receiver.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Appointing Lindsay Nielson Receiver) filed by Marine, Michelle A; White, Constance M on 03/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketApplication (EXP) - scheduled for 09/25/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketEx Parte - scheduled for 09/25/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Nancy Reinhardt Re Ex Parte Notice of Ex Parte Application For Order Appointing Receiver) filed by Marine, Michelle A; White, Constance M on 09/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Probate (Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for An Order Appointing Receiver; Declaration of Nancy Reinhardt) filed by Marine, Michelle A; White, Constance M on 09/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Nancy Reinhardt Re Ex Parte Notice of Ex Parte Petition For Letters of Special Administration) filed by Marine, Michelle A; White, Constance M on 09/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Petition to Appoint Special Administrator filed by Marine, Michelle A; White, Constance M on 09/23/2019. Filed By: White, Constance M(Proposed Executor) | Marine, Michelle A(Proposed Executor) Refers To: Marine, Wallace(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 11/07/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by White, Constance M; Marine, Michelle A on 09/23/2019. Filed By: White, Constance M(Executor) | Marine, Michelle A(Executor) Refers To: Marine, Wallace(Decedent) | Marine, Rebecca(Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REINHARDT NANCY ANN