This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 19:40:42 (UTC).

In the Matter of Victor Chavez

Case Summary

On 06/16/2011 In the Matter of Victor Chavez was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Administrators and Petitioners

Chavez, Kenneth

Friend, Angelique

Knight, Barbara

Chavez, Edward E

Claimant and Administrator

Chavez, Edward E

Defendant

Victor Chavez

Decedent

Chavez, Victor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator and Petitioner Attorneys

LONG, ROBERT I.

COLTON, RONALD L.

Onstot, W. Stephen

Administrator and Claimant Attorney

Onstot, W. Stephen

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Successor; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Successor; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J2; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Fees; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Fees; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Fees; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Fees; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2011
  • Affidavit of Publication filed by Chavez, Kenneth on 07/20/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed by Chavez, Edward E on 07/06/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Notice of Lien filed by Chavez, Edward E on 07/06/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Chavez, Edward E on 07/11/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Chavez, Kenneth on 07/01/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 08/04/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in J2 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Petition - Other (for Letters of Administration with ATA) filed by Chavez, Kenneth on 06/30/2011. Filed By: Chavez, Kenneth(Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 08/04/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Chavez, Edward E on 06/16/2011. Filed By: Chavez, Edward E(Proposed Administrator) Refers To: Knight, Barbara(Administrator) | Chavez, Victor(Decedent) | Chavez, Kenneth(Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Onstot, W Stephen