This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/29/2022 at 03:01:19 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Graham R. Paine Living Trust Dtd. April,0 2012

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 In the Matter of The Graham R Paine Living Trust Dtd April,0 2012 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura County Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Royan, Donna

Royan, Shanda

Trustee

Viets, Laura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Imel, Lawrence J

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (PR); Event Time: 1:23 PM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Description: Verified Petition in Probation for: 1. Breach of Fiduciary Duty etc.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Account and Report (PR); Description: Petition for Order Approving First-Sixth Account; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Review Hearing (PR); Description: RE: Post Mediation Status Conference; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Approving Settlement Agreement and Mutual General Release Including Agreement for Final Trust Distribution) filed by Viets, Laura on 05/11/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/11/2022 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Royan, Shanda; Royan, Donna on 05/09/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance filed by Royan, Donna; Royan, Shanda on 04/15/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition Other (PR); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAccount and Report (PR) - Petition for Order Approving First-Sixth Account scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketreceived for 201 - First papers other on 09/16/2021. Filed By: Viets, Laura(Successor Trustee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketPetition on Current Account (for Order Approving First-Sixth Account) filed by Viets, Laura on 09/16/2021. Filed By: Viets, Laura(Successor Trustee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketViets, Laura added as a Successor Trustee effective 09/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketFaxed Request for Continuance (submitted by counsel for Respondent Laura Viets) GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPetition Other (PR) - Verified Petition in Probate for: 1. Breach of Fiduciary Duty etc. scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (for 09.16.21) filed by Royan, Donna; Royan, Shanda on 08/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketPetition Other (PR) - Verified Petition in Probate for: 1. Breach of Fiduciary Duty etc. scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other (Verified Petition in Probate for: 1. Breach of Fiduciary Duty etc.) filed by Royan, Donna; Royan, Shanda on 07/27/2021. Filed By: Royan, Donna(Petitioner) | Royan, Shanda(Petitioner) Refers To: Viets, Laura(Successor Trustee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer IMEL LAWRENCE JENNINGS