This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/03/2022 at 07:03:19 (UTC).

In the Matter of Sue A. Meade

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 In the Matter of Sue A Meade was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Executor

Meade, Sandra L.

Decedent

Meade, Sue A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final with Attachments) filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 02/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketLetter issued on 02/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketLetters (Letters Testamentary Issued to Sandra L. Meade as Executor with Limited Authority) filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 02/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Administration to Creditors filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 01/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketGose, Gregory R. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder for Probate (Sandra L Meade Appointed as Executor with Limited Authority. Bond not required. Gregory Gose Appointed as Probate Referee) filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 12/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Waiver of Notice) filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 12/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Notice (by Tamara Sue Lemalu and Nomination of Sandra L. Meade as Executor) filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 12/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of No Claim- Department of Health Care Services) filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 12/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of No Claim -Franchise Tax Board) filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 12/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 11/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate (for 12.16.21) filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 11/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary - scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary filed by Meade, Sandra L. on 11/02/2021. Filed By: Meade, Sandra L.(Executor) Refers To: Meade, Sue(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD