This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 00:35:44 (UTC).

In The Matter of Rosen

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 In The Matter of Rosen was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Von Rosen, Mildred

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: OSC - Change of Name; Description: Mildred Von Rosen et al; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name filed by Von Rosen, Mildred on 01/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Publication (Santa Paula Times. Dates of service: 11/27/2020, 12/04, 12/11, & 12/18/2020) filed by Von Rosen, Mildred on 12/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOSC - Change of Name - Mildred Von Rosen et al scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Von Rosen, Mildred on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Von Rosen, Mildred on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Von Rosen, Mildred on 11/20/2020. Filed By: Von Rosen, Mildred(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less