Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/03/2020 at 05:58:36 (UTC).

In The Matter of Ricardo Hugo Lopez Hernandez

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 In The Matter of Ricardo Hugo Lopez Hernandez was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Administrator

Ventura County Public Administrator

Decedent

Lopez Hernandez, Richardo Hugo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

SMITH, LEROY

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketLetter issued on 02/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketLetters (Issued To Ventura Public Administrator) filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 02/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketTentler, Richard W. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder for Probate (Appointing Ventura County Public Administrator With Full Authority, Bond Fixed At $800,000; Richard Tentler Appointed Probate Referee) filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 01/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. heard 01/08/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketThe Court appoints Ventura County Public Administrator as Administrator.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 12/13/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 11/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 01/08/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Ventura County Public Administrator on 11/22/2019. Filed By: Ventura County Public Administrator(Administrator) Refers To: Lopez Hernandez, Richardo(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, LEROY