This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 16:51:55 (UTC).

In the Matter of Phillip James Savala, Jr.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 In the Matter of Phillip James Savala, Jr was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Administrators

Ayers, Carol

Savala, Rae M

Savala, Sherre

Decedent

Savala, Phillip James Jr

Interested Party

Inheritance Funding Company Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorneys

Baskin, Robert M

FOX, BRIAN L.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Letters of Administration; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication (for 01.27.22) filed by Savala, Sherre on 01/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSavala, Sherre added as a Proposed Administrator effective 12/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Savala, Sherre on 12/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSavala, Rae M Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Savala, Rae M on 10/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Savala, Rae M on 10/18/2021. Filed By: Savala, Rae M(Proposed Administrator) Refers To: Savala, Phillip(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFOX, BRIAN L. added as a effective 10/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSavala, Rae M added as a Proposed Administrator effective 10/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Ayers, Carol on 10/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Ayers, Carol on 10/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Ayers, Carol on 10/07/2021. Filed By: Ayers, Carol(Proposed Administrator) Refers To: Savala, Phillip(Decedent) | Inheritance Funding Company Inc.(Interested Party) | Savala, Sherre(Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX, BRIAN L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baskin, Robert M