This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/08/2023 at 08:02:21 (UTC).

In the Matter of Patricia Ann Kaiser

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 In the Matter of Patricia Ann Kaiser was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura County Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Executor

Kaiser, Kevin D

Decedent

Kaiser, Patricia Ann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

Michie, Douglas C.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Docketreceived for 202 - Subsequent papers - petitions, objections or other papers in opposition on 03/06/2023. Filed By: Kaiser, Kevin D(Executor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketWaiver of Accounting and Final Distribution - First and Final Report of Personal Representative and Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account and for Payment of Compensation for Ordinary and/or Extraordinary Services to Attorney for Personal Representative scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice to Director of the California Department of Health Care Services) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice to Franchise Tax Board of Administration of Estate) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketWaiver of Accounting (Keyara Kaiser) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketPetition on Final Account (First and Final Report of Personal Representative and Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account and for Payment of Compensation for Ordinary and/or Extraordinary Services to Attorney for Personal Representative) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023. Filed By: Kaiser, Kevin D(Executor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final with Attachments) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 02/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketLetter issued on 11/21/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketLetters filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 11/21/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,020 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less