This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 00:03:04 (UTC).

In the Matter of Patricia Ann Kaiser

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 In the Matter of Patricia Ann Kaiser was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura County Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Executor

Kaiser, Kevin D

Decedent

Kaiser, Patricia Ann

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A.; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution; Description: First and Final Report of Personal Representative and Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of A...; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Docketreceived for 202 - Subsequent papers - petitions, objections or other papers in opposition on 03/06/2023. Filed By: Kaiser, Kevin D(Executor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketWaiver of Accounting and Final Distribution - First and Final Report of Personal Representative and Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account and for Payment of Compensation for Ordinary and/or Extraordinary Services to Attorney for Personal Representative scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice to Director of the California Department of Health Care Services) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice to Franchise Tax Board of Administration of Estate) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketWaiver of Accounting (Keyara Kaiser) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketPetition on Final Account (First and Final Report of Personal Representative and Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account and for Payment of Compensation for Ordinary and/or Extraordinary Services to Attorney for Personal Representative) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 03/06/2023. Filed By: Kaiser, Kevin D(Executor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final with Attachments) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 02/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketLetter issued on 11/21/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketContinued on Court's own motion.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Affidavit of Subscribing Witness Karen Sinchak) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 09/29/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication (of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate of Patricia Ann Kaiser) filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 09/21/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 08/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 08/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Kaiser, Kevin D on 08/05/2022. Filed By: Kaiser, Kevin D(Executor) Refers To: Kaiser, Patricia(Decedent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less