Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 02:47:17 (UTC).

In The Matter of Neal B. Warth

Case Summary

On 05/21/2015 In The Matter of Neal B Warth was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Administrator

Bradley, Elva J.

Decedent

Warth, Neal B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

Pfau, Matthew G

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Description: First and Final Account and Report of Administration and Petition for its Settlement; etc; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Description: First and Final Account and Report of Administration and Petition for its Settlement; etc; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Order for Final Discharge (Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order) filed by Bradley, Elva J. on 05/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2015
  • The Court appoints Elva Bradley as Administrator.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Affidavit of Publication filed by Bradley, Elva J. on 06/19/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • 40.00 received for 211-Request for Special Notice on 06/17/2015 from .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Request for Special Notice filed by Inheritance Funding Company, Inc. on 06/11/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Miscellaneous (Michael Warth's Assignment #1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest in Decedent's Estate to Inheritance Funding Company, Inc.) filed by Inheritance Funding Company, Inc. on 06/11/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Inheritance Funding Company, Inc. added as a Interested Party effective 06/17/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (on 6/25/15) filed by Bradley, Elva J. on 06/01/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 06/25/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Bradley, Elva J. on 05/21/2015. Filed By: Bradley, Elva J.(Administrator) Refers To: Warth, Neal(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PFAU MATTHEW G