Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 01:30:11 (UTC).

In the Matter of Natalie Sabbe

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 In the Matter of Natalie Sabbe was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservators

Sabbe, Marcia

Sabbe, Steven

Conservatee

Sabbe, Natalie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

LASHLEY, KELLEY BANNON

Other Attorneys

Taylor, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 2/28/22; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Appraisal and Inventory; Description: Due 6/1/21; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final With Attachment 1) filed by Sabbe, Marcia; Sabbe, Steven on 06/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Description: Due 4/27/21; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDetermination of Conservatee's Level of Care filed by Sabbe, Steven; Sabbe, Marcia on 04/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Co-Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Sabbe, Marcia; Sabbe, Steven on 12/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Sabbe, Marcia; Sabbe, Steven on 12/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Sabbe, Marcia; Sabbe, Steven on 12/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Sabbe, Marcia; Sabbe, Steven on 12/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Temporary Conservatorship of Person & Estate scheduled for 12/04/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Co-Conservator - Person & Estate scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator (Person & Estate) filed by Sabbe, Marcia; Sabbe, Steven on 12/02/2020. Filed By: Sabbe, Marcia(Conservator) | Sabbe, Steven(Conservator) Refers To: Sabbe, Natalie(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by Sabbe, Steven; Sabbe, Marcia on 12/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Co-Conservators filed by Sabbe, Steven; Sabbe, Marcia on 12/02/2020. Filed By: Sabbe, Marcia(Proposed Conservator) | Sabbe, Steven(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Sabbe, Natalie(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Daniel