Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 14:27:54 (UTC).

In The Matter of Muriel Schreiber

Case Summary

On 06/06/2014 In The Matter of Muriel Schreiber was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

Barry L Zimmerman, Ventura County Public Guardian

Conservatee

Schreiber, Muriel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorneys

SMITH, LEROY

Davis, Mitchell B

Conservatee Attorney

SHEA, MARY C

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Annual Status Report due 08/19/15; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Review Hearing (PRC); Description: Re: Verify Filing Annual Status Report due 08/19/15; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Description: Final Account and Report; Fee Request; Petition for Termination of Conservatorship Due to Death of C...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (PRC); Description: re: Status of Final Account; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2014
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • Confidential Investigator report finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Citation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service filed by Barry L Zimmerman, Ventura County Public Guardian on 08/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed by Barry L Zimmerman, Ventura County Public Guardian on 06/06/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator - Conservatorship of the Person and Estate scheduled for 08/19/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Citation issued on 06/06/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Barry L Zimmerman, Ventura County Public Guardian on 06/06/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Barry L Zimmerman, Ventura County Public Guardian on 06/06/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed by Barry L Zimmerman, Ventura County Public Guardian on 06/06/2014. Filed By: Barry L Zimmerman, Ventura County Public Guardian(Conservator) Refers To: Schreiber, Muriel(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barry L Zimmerman, Ventura County Public Guardian is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA, MARY C