This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 00:14:17 (UTC).

In the Matter of Monica Hutchinson

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 In the Matter of Monica Hutchinson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservators

Hutchinson, Neil

Ledesma Oviedo, Martha Elsa

Conservatee

Hutchinson, Monica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

SCHNEIDER, DAVID R.

Other Attorneys

Taylor, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 03/14/22; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Care Plan; Description: Due 05/11/21; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing Re: Care Plan heard 06/15/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDetermination of Conservatee's Level of Care filed by Hutchinson, Neil; Ledesma Oviedo, Martha Elsa on 04/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketLetter issued on 03/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other (for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person (Limited Conservatorship)) filed by Hutchinson, Neil; Ledesma Oviedo, Martha Elsa on 02/02/2021. Filed By: Ledesma Oviedo, Martha Elsa(Proposed Conservator) | Hutchinson, Neil(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Hutchinson, Monica(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Petition Other (PRC); Description: for Orders Accepting Transfer; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketFax Request for Continuance and Order (Granted) filed by Hutchinson, Neil; Ledesma Oviedo, Martha Elsa on 01/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPetition Other (PRC) - for Orders Accepting Transfer scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship (for 01.26.21) filed by Hutchinson, Neil; Ledesma Oviedo, Martha Elsa on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPetition Other (PRC) - for Orders Accepting Transfer scheduled for 01/26/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketPetition - Other (for Orders Accepting Transfer) filed by Hutchinson, Neil; Ledesma Oviedo, Martha Elsa on 11/20/2020. Filed By: Ledesma Oviedo, Martha Elsa(Limited Conservator of Person Only) | Hutchinson, Neil(Limited Conservator of Person Only) Refers To: Hutchinson, Monica(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Daniel