This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 03:02:29 (UTC).

In the Matter of Michael D Washington

Case Summary

On 12/20/2011 In the Matter of Michael D Washington was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Decedent

Washington, Michael D

Administrators

Lomax, Gloria J

Washington, Edwin L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

Smiley, Lynn A.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2012
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Lomax, Gloria J on 01/27/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 03/01/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • Petition - Other (for Letters of Administration with ATA) filed by Lomax, Gloria J on 01/27/2012. Filed By: Lomax, Gloria J(Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • Affidavit of Publication filed by Washington, Edwin L on 01/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 02/01/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Washington, Edwin L on 12/20/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Washington, Edwin L on 12/20/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Washington, Edwin L on 12/20/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Washington, Edwin L on 12/20/2011. Filed By: Washington, Edwin L(Administrator) Refers To: Lomax, Gloria(Administrator) | Washington, Michael(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smiley, Lynn A.